U.S. BANK, N.A. v. WILSON et al
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Defendant: JOHNETTE P. WILSON and ZENOBIA WILSON
Case Number: 1:2018cv02106
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand. The Court ORDERS that the matter is REMANDED to the Superior Court for the District of Columbia for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/29/2018. (lcjeb1)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Glass, Daniel) Modified on 10/12/2018 (znmw).
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. BANK, N.A.. (Glass, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Glass on behalf of U.S. BANK, N.A. (Glass, Daniel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Receipt on 9/25/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca1124. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 4, #2 Part 3 of 4, #3 Part 4 of 4)(zrdj)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZENOBIA WILSON, JOHNETTE P. WILSON from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 001124 R(RP). (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094450) filed by ZENOBIA WILSON, JOHNETTE P. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. BANK, N.A. v. WILSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNETTE P. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZENOBIA WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?