ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY, ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL, ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL, ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, TRACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02113
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:2005
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/27/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/24/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2018.) (MacCarthy, Sara)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-00867-CKK. (MacCarthy, Sara)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL, ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL, ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH, ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL, ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH (MacCarthy, Sara)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5683524) filed by ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY, AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH, ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS, ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(MacCarthy, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AULTMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?