YUSSUF v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Plaintiff: ASHANTE YUSSUF
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02118
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Receipt on 9/26/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5543. (zrdj)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to dispositive motion due by 10/25/2018. (tg)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/25/2018 to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 9/25/18. (ms)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Barnhart, Virginia)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
September 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ERRATA **Concerning Notice of Removal** by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnhart, Virginia)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal (Revised) to correct filing errors by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnhart, Virginia)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Barnhart, Virginia)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia W. Barnhart on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 18-0005543 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5685265 filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court)(Barnhart, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUSSUF v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHANTE YUSSUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Virginia W. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?