KADRICH v. CVS PHARMACY, INC.

Plaintiff: LEO KADRICH
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02120
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS PHARMACY, INC. . (Norton, Ashley)
October 24, 2018 11 Featured Case DISCOVERY STANDING ORDER. Status Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/24/2018. (lcgmh2)
October 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/10/2019. Dispositive Motion due by 5/31/2019. Response to Dispositive Motion due by 6/14/2019. Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 6/21/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/22/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 3/22/2019. (tb)
October 22, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE for all purposes, including trial. SO ORDERED - by Judge John D. Bates on 10/22/18. (tb)
October 22, 2018 10 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by CVS PHARMACY, INC. and LEO KADRICH. (tb)
October 22, 2018 Minute Entry: Scheduling Conference held on 10/22/2018 before Judge John D. Bates: Parties have consented to proceed before a magistrate judge for all purposes. Status Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. See Order previously entered. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
October 22, 2018 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/22/2018. (lcjdb2)
October 15, 2018 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Singer, Daniel)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents was entered in error and is a duplicate of entry no. #6 . (td)
September 26, 2018 7 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Receipt on 9/26/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5884. (zrdj) Modified on 9/27/2018 (td).
September 26, 2018 6 Receipt on 9/26/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5884. (zrdj)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (jth)
September 21, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER setting initial scheduling conference. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/21/2018. (lcjdb2)
September 20, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint by CVS PHARMACY, INC..(Norton, Ashley)
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb)
September 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb)
September 12, 2018 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Norton, Ashley)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior, case number 2018 CA 005884 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5685627 filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Norton, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KADRICH v. CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO KADRICH
Represented By: Daniel S. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Ashley A. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?