JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02125
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2018. Rolling releases shall commence on 12/21/2018; Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
October 30, 2018 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney April Seabrook (Nebeker, William)
October 25, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramona Raula Cotca on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona)
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
October 24, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 30, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2018. (lcrdm2, )
October 24, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Seabrook, April)
October 2, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/24/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul)
September 17, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/17/2018. (lcrdm2, )
September 17, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd)
September 13, 2018 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5686946) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Represented By: Ramona Raula Cotca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?