DC2NY, INC. v. ACADEMY BUS, LLC

Plaintiff: BESTBUS COMPANY and DC2NY, INC.
Defendant: ACADEMY BUS TOURS, INC.. and ACADEMY BUS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02127
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by ACADEMY BUS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Prywes, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including October 29, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/3/2018. (lcrc2)
October 3, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACADEMY BUS, LLC. (Schutt, Frederick)
October 3, 2018 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ACADEMY BUS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schutt, Frederick)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/12/2018. (tth)
October 1, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ACADEMY BUS, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Modified text on 10/4/2018 (tth).
September 18, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ACADEMY BUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ACADEMY BUS, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5687085) filed by DC2NY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Werner, Ursula) Modified on 9/17/2018 (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DC2NY, INC. v. ACADEMY BUS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BESTBUS COMPANY
Represented By: Ursula Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DC2NY, INC.
Represented By: Ursula Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACADEMY BUS TOURS, INC..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACADEMY BUS, LLC
Represented By: Frederick H. Schutt
Represented By: Daniel I. Prywes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?