FAHEY v. FRONTERA FOODS, INC.

Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Defendant: FRONTERA FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02134
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER in view of #9 notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2018. (lcegs3)
October 5, 2018 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Willcox, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff To Serve The Defendant due by 10/29/2018. (mac)
October 1, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time to serve defendant. The plaintiff is therefore directed to serve the defendant by no later than October 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/1/2018. (lcegs3)
September 28, 2018 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Willcox, Thomas)
September 26, 2018 7 Receipt on 9/26/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5498. (zrdj)
September 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 10/22/2018. (mac)
September 18, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #6 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file answer. The defendant shall therefore answer, or otherwise respond, to plaintiff's complaint by no later than October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/18/2018. (lcegs3)
September 18, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, re Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by FRONTERA FOODS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molter, Derek)
September 18, 2018 5 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/18/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd)
September 14, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRONTERA FOODS, INC.. (Molter, Derek)
September 14, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek R. Molter on behalf of FRONTERA FOODS, INC. (Molter, Derek)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 005498 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5689105 filed by FRONTERA FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Illinois Secretary of State Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molter, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAHEY v. FRONTERA FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRONTERA FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Derek R. Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?