WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

Plaintiff: WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02135
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 28, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/31/2018. (lcabj2)
October 31, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Hendry, Melanie)
October 16, 2018 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02260-TJK. (Apfel, Carrie)
October 8, 2018 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2018. (Apfel, Carrie)
October 8, 2018 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/01/2018. (Apfel, Carrie)
October 8, 2018 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/28/2018 (Apfel, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 24, 2018 5 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave of Alexis Andiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/24/18. (DMK)
September 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd)
September 21, 2018 ATTORNEY RENEWAL fee received: $ 25.00, online pay.gov receipt number: 0090-5699767. (zmd)
September 14, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIERRA CLUB. (Apfel, Carrie)
September 14, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE. (Apfel, Carrie)
September 14, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexis Andiman, :Firm- Earthjustice, :Address- 48 Wall Street, 15th Floor, New York, NY 10005. Phone No. - (212) 845-7376. Fax No. - (212) 918-1556 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5689382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SIERRA CLUB, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexis Andiman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Apfel, Carrie)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5689367) filed by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons to Wheeler, #8 Summons to Sessions, #9 Summons to Liu)(Apfel, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE
Represented By: Carrie F. Apfel
Represented By: Alexis Andiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Carrie F. Apfel
Represented By: Alexis Andiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?