MARTINEZ VASQUEZ et al v. BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC et al

Plaintiff: CELVIN MARTINEZ VASQUEZ and LINTON MARTINEZ VASQUEZ
Defendant: ASCHARA VIGSITTABOOT and BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02142
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER in view of #6 notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2018. (lcegs3)
October 31, 2018 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or otherwise Reply To The Plaintiffs' Complaint due by 10/31/2018. (mac)
October 11, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #5 consent motion for extension of time. The defendants shall therefore answer or otherwise reply to the plaintiffs' complaint by no later than October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/11/2018. (lcegs3)
October 10, 2018 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC, ASCHARA VIGSITTABOOT (Rome, Scott)
September 20, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
September 19, 2018 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/19/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 18, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC, ASCHARA VIGSITTABOOT. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5690994) filed by LINTON MARTINEZ VASQUEZ, CELVIN MARTINEZ VASQUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (2))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ VASQUEZ et al v. BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELVIN MARTINEZ VASQUEZ
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINTON MARTINEZ VASQUEZ
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCHARA VIGSITTABOOT
Represented By: Scott Howard Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAU THAI SHAW, LLC
Represented By: Scott Howard Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?