FLETCHER v. JONES

Plaintiff: DEBORAH DIANE FLETCHER
Defendant: GRACE JONES
Case Number: 1:2018cv02179
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Ordered that the #2 application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Ordered that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), the Court certifies that an appeal of this final order would not be taken in good faith. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (zrdj)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (zrdj)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to DEBORAH DIANE FLETCHER; Type of Document Returned: Docket Sheet. (zsb)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEBORAH DIANE FLETCHER (zrdj)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GRACE JONES filed by DEBORAH DIANE FLETCHER.(zrdj)
September 21, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/21/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLETCHER v. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH DIANE FLETCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?