STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv02205
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
0 Judge: Rudolph Contreras
1 Judge: G Michael Harvey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion for Discovery; Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (lcgmh1)
October 25, 2018 5 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/25/18. (lcgmh1)
October 22, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management. (ad)
October 22, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER referring this case to a Magistrate Judge for full case management. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 22, 2018. (lcrc3)
October 20, 2018 3 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Haire, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOHN DOE. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (zmd)
September 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703028) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Haire, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?