STRASSER v. DICKENS

Plaintiff: Ryan J Strasser and RYAN J. STRASSER
Defendant: Sarah Jones Dickens
Case Number: 1:2018cv02207
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SARAH JONES DICKENS served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018 (Hollman, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SARAH JONES DICKENS. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SARAH JONES DICKENS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703169) filed by RYAN J. STRASSER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons)(Hollman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRASSER v. DICKENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan J Strasser
Represented By: Steven P. Hollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN J. STRASSER
Represented By: Steven P. Hollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jones Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?