SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. 1POOL LTD. et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: PATRICK BRUNNER and 1POOL LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02244
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. PATRICK BRUNNER waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Davis, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. 1POOL LTD. waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Davis, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/04/2018. (lctnm2)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to 1POOL LTD., PATRICK BRUNNER. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 1, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Davis, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02243. (Davis, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Davis, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. 1POOL LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK BRUNNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1POOL LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Christopher Allen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?