ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Plaintiff: BEATRIZ BELTRAN, RONALD EVERETT LOTT, RAMONA BELTRAN, VALENTIN BELTRAN, MARIA LUISA CASTILLO, ALEX PHONGPHACHONE, SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE, RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER, GAIL FORTNER LOTT, J.C.I-G., ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO, WILLIAM LEE NELSON, JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT, CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ, SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO, GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK, MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER, MARIA BELTRAN, ELIZABETH ANNE YORK, RENE GUTEL, RONALD ALLEN EATON, RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN, M.A.S., CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI, TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE, WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO, JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO, FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN, QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON, SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA, TONI KAY ATTANASIO, JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES, SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ, VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI, BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER, ANA M. GOMEZ, ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT, TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO, LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE, ROBERT FERGUSON, EDWARD RAYMOND YORK, RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE, TANYA M. DIGGS, OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II, BENTE KRISTIN YORK, JAMES MICHAEL LOTT, TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON, RANDI JEAN MARTZ, DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS and ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK
Defendant: NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02248
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by TONI KAY ATTANASIO, BEATRIZ BELTRAN, FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN, MARIA BELTRAN, RAMONA BELTRAN, VALENTIN BELTRAN, JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES, ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO, JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO, SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO, MARIA LUISA CASTILLO, TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO, WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO, OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II, TANYA M. DIGGS, RONALD ALLEN EATON, QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON, TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON, ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK, ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT, ROBERT FERGUSON, GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK, BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER, MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER, RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER, ANA M. GOMEZ, RENE GUTEL, JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT, SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ, J.C.I-G., GAIL FORTNER LOTT, JAMES MICHAEL LOTT, RONALD EVERETT LOTT, M.A.S., RANDI JEAN MARTZ, SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE, TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE, WILLIAM LEE NELSON, SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA, CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ, VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI, ALEX PHONGPHACHONE, LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE, RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE, RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN, CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI, DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS, BENTE KRISTIN YORK, EDWARD RAYMOND YORK, ELIZABETH ANNE YORK(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Nations, Howard)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal. The Court will deny as moot #2 Plaintiffs' earlier motion seeking the same. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/30/2018. (lccrc2)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File JPlaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by TONI KAY ATTANASIO, BEATRIZ BELTRAN, FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN, MARIA BELTRAN, RAMONA BELTRAN, VALENTIN BELTRAN, JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES, ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO, JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO, SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO, MARIA LUISA CASTILLO, TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO, WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO, OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II, TANYA M. DIGGS, RONALD ALLEN EATON, QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON, TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON, ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK, ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT, ROBERT FERGUSON, GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK, BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER, MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER, RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER, ANA M. GOMEZ, RENE GUTEL, JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT, SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ, J.C.I-G., GAIL FORTNER LOTT, JAMES MICHAEL LOTT, RONALD EVERETT LOTT, M.A.S., RANDI JEAN MARTZ, SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE, TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE, WILLIAM LEE NELSON, SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA, CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ, VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI, ALEX PHONGPHACHONE, LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE, RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE, RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN, CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI, DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS, BENTE KRISTIN YORK, EDWARD RAYMOND YORK, ELIZABETH ANNE YORK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/9/2018. (DM)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-01612-CKK. (Nations, Howard)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by TONI KAY ATTANASIO, BEATRIZ BELTRAN, FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN, MARIA BELTRAN, RAMONA BELTRAN, VALENTIN BELTRAN, JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES, ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO, JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO, SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO, MARIA LUISA CASTILLO, TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO, WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO, OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II, TANYA M. DIGGS, RONALD ALLEN EATON, QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON, TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON, ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK, ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT, ROBERT FERGUSON, GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK, BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER, MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER, RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER, ANA M. GOMEZ, RENE GUTEL, JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT, SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ, J.C.I-G., GAIL FORTNER LOTT, JAMES MICHAEL LOTT, RONALD EVERETT LOTT, M.A.S., RANDI JEAN MARTZ, SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE, TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE, WILLIAM LEE NELSON, SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA, CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ, VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI, ALEX PHONGPHACHONE, LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE, RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE, RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN, CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI, DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS, BENTE KRISTIN YORK, EDWARD RAYMOND YORK, ELIZABETH ANNE YORK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5710416) filed by SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO, JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES, DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS, QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON, MARIA LUISA CASTILLO, SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE, TONI KAY ATTANASIO, ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK, EDWARD RAYMOND YORK, GAIL FORTNER LOTT, TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE, CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI, VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI, TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO, WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO, RAMONA BELTRAN, ELIZABETH ANNE YORK, RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE, M.A.S., MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER, ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT, RONALD EVERETT LOTT, SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA, JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT, RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN, ROBERT FERGUSON, RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER, SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ, ALEX PHONGPHACHONE, BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER, JAMES MICHAEL LOTT, ANA M. GOMEZ, RONALD ALLEN EATON, VALENTIN BELTRAN, JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO, GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK, TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON, WILLIAM LEE NELSON, FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN, LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE, J.C.I-G., TANYA M. DIGGS, BEATRIZ BELTRAN, RANDI JEAN MARTZ, MARIA BELTRAN, CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ, ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO, BENTE KRISTIN YORK, OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II, RENE GUTEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bank Markazi Jomhouri Islami Iran, #3 Summons Bank Melli Iran, #4 Summons Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security, #5 Summons Islamic Republic of Iran, #6 Summons Islamic Rev. Guard Corp (IRGC), #7 Summons National Iranian Oil Co.)(Nations, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEATRIZ BELTRAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD EVERETT LOTT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA BELTRAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALENTIN BELTRAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA LUISA CASTILLO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX PHONGPHACHONE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA JAYNE MCKENZIE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD DEWAYNE FOSTER
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL FORTNER LOTT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.I-G.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALONSO BELTRAN-SOTO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LEE NELSON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MICHELLE HEBERT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS GOMEZ PEREZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVADOR BELTRAN-SOTO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY DOUGLAS FISHBECK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW RYAN FOSTER
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA BELTRAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ANNE YORK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE GUTEL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD ALLEN EATON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LLANCE SCHWAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.S.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLOTILDE JOY SZELKOWSKI
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PADRAC MCKENZIE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILFREDO RAMIREZ CASTILLO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE BELTRAN-SOTO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO FELIX BELTRAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUANTE MAURICE EGGLESTON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY YIENNE PARTIDA
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI KAY ATTANASIO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SALVADOR BELTRAN-DAVES
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA IZAGUIRRE-GOMEZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA ELENA PHILLIPPI
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MICHAEL FOSTER
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA M. GOMEZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JUSTIN WILLIAM HEBERT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESITA SAPITULA CASTILLO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN MACEY PHONGPHACHONE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FERGUSON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD RAYMOND YORK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN MICHAEL PHONGPHACHONE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA M. DIGGS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN EUGENE CHISMAR, II
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENTE KRISTIN YORK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL LOTT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRA SIMONE EGGLESTON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDI JEAN MARTZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID KENNETH WILLIAMS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER BROOK FISHBECK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MELLI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?