ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR, II
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF MIAMI, INC., BAPTIST HEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC., BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, INC., CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CLIFTON SPRINGS SANITARIUM COMPANY, DAVIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CIRCLE HEALTH, INC., BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DAVIS HOSPITAL HOLDINGS AND IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., BRIM HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, CHENANGO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BOWLING GREEN-WARREN COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL CORP.,, BRONXCARE HEALTH SYSTEM, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER and ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02256
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2018. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2018. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/22/2018 (Webster, Stephanie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zmd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM, ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC., BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF MIAMI, INC., BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, BOWLING GREEN-WARREN COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL CORP.,, BRIM HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, LLC, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, INC., BRONXCARE HEALTH SYSTEM, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, CHENANGO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, CIRCLE HEALTH, INC., CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER, CLIFTON SPRINGS SANITARIUM COMPANY, COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, DAVIS HOSPITAL HOLDINGS AND IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, DAVIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM INC., ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER (Webster, Stephanie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5711913) filed by DAVIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM, DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, CHENANGO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BAPTIST HEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC., DAVIS HOSPITAL HOLDINGS AND IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF MIAMI, INC., BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, BRONXCARE HEALTH SYSTEM, BRIM HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, LLC, COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM INC., CLIFTON SPRINGS SANITARIUM COMPANY, CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, BROCKTON HOSPITAL, INC., ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BOWLING GREEN-WARREN COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL CORP.,, CIRCLE HEALTH, INC., CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF MIAMI, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCKTON HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFTON SPRINGS SANITARIUM COMPANY
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIRCLE HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS HOSPITAL HOLDINGS AND IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA MAASS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIM HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHENANGO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOWLING GREEN-WARREN COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL CORP.,
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRONXCARE HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLINA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?