PROMUNDO-US v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: PROMUNDO-US
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ALEX M AZAR II and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02261
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/1/2018, (ztd)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2018. (Dennis, Marie) Modified dates on 10/9/2018 (ztd).
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case as case deemed unrelated. (ztnr)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M AZAR II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 1, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie S. Dennis on behalf of PROMUNDO-US (Dennis, Marie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by April N. Ross on behalf of PROMUNDO-US (Ross, April)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Flynn on behalf of PROMUNDO-US (Flynn, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROMUNDO-US. (Dennis, Marie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROMUNDO-US. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-992-KBJ, 18-cv-971--KBJ, 18-cv-346-KBJ, 18-cv-01042-KBJ. (Dennis, Marie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Promundo-US against ALEX M AZAR II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5712308) filed by PROMUNDO-US. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Dennis, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROMUNDO-US v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROMUNDO-US
Represented By: April N. Ross
Represented By: Marie S. Dennis
Represented By: Christopher Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?