MOADDAB v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD MOADDAB
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02292
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Initial Disclosure due by 3/18/2019. Parties to advise court of intentions regarding settlement conference or mediation due by 2/1/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 6/1/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2019. Post-Discovery Hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Rule 16.3 Meet and Confer Statement, it is hereby ORDERED that discovery in this case shall proceed according to the following schedule: Preliminary Document Discovery begins November 27, 2018; Preliminary Document Discovery Ends January 15, 2019; Parties to advise the Court whether they believe they could benefit from mediation or whether discovery should proceed; Initial Disclosures due by March 18, 2019; Motion for Leave to Add Parties or Amend the Pleadings due by May 1, 2019; Proponent's Expert Disclosures due by June 1, 2019; Opponent's Expert Disclosures due by July 31, 2019; Close of Discovery on August 30, 2019; Post-Discovery Status Conference on September 4, 2019 in Courtroom 27A at 10:00 AM (SEE FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2018. (lccrc1)
November 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2018. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (znbn)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Discovery Scheduling Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
November 5, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER moving the Initial Scheduling Conference set for November 27, 2018 in Courtroom 27A to begin at 10:30 AM rather than 11:00 AM as previously scheduled in the #9 Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/2/2018. (lccrc1)
October 18, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) Modified on 10/19/2018 (zlsj).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER vacating the Court's previous Order #8 setting an Initial Scheduling Conference and setting the Initial Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, November 27, 2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/18/2018. (lccrc1) Modified on 10/19/2018 (zlsj).
October 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znbn)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for November 14, 2018, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/11/2018. (lccrc1) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/11/2018) (znbn).
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses of Defendant by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Lambert, Patricia)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Lambert on behalf of NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Lambert, Patricia)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrdj)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE STATEMENT OF FILING AND SERVICE OF NOTIFICATION OF REMOVAL by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Lambert, Patricia)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE CERTIFICATION OF FILING OF STATE COURT PAPERS by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Patricia)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lambert, Patricia)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 006095 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5719003 filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents)(Lambert, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOADDAB v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Patricia M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD MOADDAB
Represented By: Christopher G. Hoge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?