VARGAS DUBON et al v. MIK AND MI, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JOSE VARGAS DUBON and NOE GUZMAN LOPEZ
Defendant: SUE MI FOULADI and MIK AND MI, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02300
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zcdw)
October 31, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for December 18, 2018 at 10:15 a.m. The parties' joint report is due December 11, 2018. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/31/2018. (DAS)
October 30, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MIK AND MI, INC..(Henry, Jeanett)
October 30, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanett P. Henry on behalf of All Defendants (Henry, Jeanett)
October 10, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SUE MI FOULADI served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 10, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MIK AND MI, INC. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 5, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to SUE MI FOULADI, MIK AND MI, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
October 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zsb)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5723609) filed by JOSE VARGAS DUBON, NOE GUZMAN LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (2))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VARGAS DUBON et al v. MIK AND MI, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE VARGAS DUBON
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOE GUZMAN LOPEZ
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUE MI FOULADI
Represented By: Jeanett P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIK AND MI, INC.
Represented By: Jeanett P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?