COOPER-JACKSON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

Plaintiff: Dawn Cooper-Jackson
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02315
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2018 8 Featured Case GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/5/2018. (lckbj1)
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/13/2018. (gdf)
November 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Life Insurance Company of North America shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/26/2018. (lckbj2)
November 20, 2018 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (Reza, Syed) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/21/2018) (zjf).
November 20, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Unopposed Motion of Defendant for Extension of Time to Serve and File Responsive Pleadings by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
October 22, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark DeBofsky on behalf of DAWN COOPER-JACKSON (DeBofsky, Mark)
October 18, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Mark DeBofsky is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/18/2018. (lckbj1)
October 16, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark DeBofsky, :Firm- DeBofsky, Sherman & Casciari P.C., :Address- 200 West Madison St, Suite 2670. Phone No. - (312) 235-4880. Fax No. - (312) 929-0309 Filing fee $ 100, re by DAWN COOPER-JACKSON. (Clark, Denise)
October 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Pending before the Court is a motion for leave for Mark DeBofsky to appear pro hac vice in this matter. This Court's Local Rules delineate the materials that must be submitted in support of a pro hac motion, including a declaration from the attorney to be admitted; no such declaration is attached to Plaintiff's motion. See LCvR 83.2(d). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the declaration required by LCvR 83.2(d) on or before 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2018. (lckbj1)
October 12, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark DeBofsky, :Firm- DeBofsky, Sherman & Casciari P.C., :Address- 200 West Madison St, Suite 2670. Phone No. - (312) 235-4880. Fax No. - (312) 929-0309 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5736789. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DAWN COOPER-JACKSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Denise)
October 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5726811) filed by DAWN COOPER-JACKSON Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Clark, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER-JACKSON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Cooper-Jackson
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark
Represented By: Mark DeBofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Syed M. Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?