IN RE: MAX E. SALAS
Appellant: GAIL GREGORY BREKELMANS, MARTHA JOHNSON, NICOLAAS J. BREKELMANS and MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN
Appellee: MAX E. SALAS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02318
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Principal Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that Appellants shall file their Principal Brief on or before 12/18/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/7/2018. (lckbj1)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants Principal Brief by GAIL GREGORY BREKELMANS, NICOLAAS J. BREKELMANS, MARTHA JOHNSON, MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNutt, Philip)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #3 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability, (zrdj)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 18-260. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN, MARTHA JOHNSON, GAIL GREGORY BREKELMANS, NICOLAAS J. BREKELMANS. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Locked Transcript 8-22-18, #3 Locked Transcript 8-23-18, #4 Locked Transcript 8-24-18)(zrdj)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (lckbj1)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-260. filed by MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN, GAIL GREGORY BREKELMANS, NICOLAAS J. BREKELMANS, MARTHA JOHNSON.(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: MAX E. SALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GAIL GREGORY BREKELMANS
Represented By: Philip James McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARTHA JOHNSON
Represented By: Philip James McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NICOLAAS J. BREKELMANS
Represented By: Philip James McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MICHAEL MCLOUGHLIN
Represented By: Philip James McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAX E. SALAS
Represented By: Marc E. Albert
Represented By: Joshua Welch Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?