CARLTON v. SMITH

Petitioner: PETERA MICALE CARLTON
Respondent: MICHAEL D. SMITH
Case Number: 1:2018cv02333
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the #3 application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (zrdj)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (zrdj)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-03301. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the District of Columbia. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that case is TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed on September 17, 2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Petera Micale Carlton. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM of law in support of habeas corpus petition (Doc. #1 ) filed by Petera Micale Carlton.(Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with supplemental brief in support filed by Petera Micale Carlton.(Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARLTON v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PETERA MICALE CARLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?