DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02346
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grogg, Adam)
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (hmc)
November 19, 2018 9 Featured Case Order. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter no later than December 19, 2018. See attached order for further details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/19/2018. (lctnm2)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer was entered in the wrong case. Please refile said pleading in the correct case. (tth)
November 15, 2018 8 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia); Modified on 11/16/2018 (tth).
November 15, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(McBride, Patricia)
October 22, 2018 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/19/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 10/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Grogg, Adam)
October 12, 2018 5 Featured Case STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/12/2018. (lctnm2)
October 12, 2018 4 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
October 12, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd)
October 11, 2018 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Grogg, Adam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/12/2018) (zjd).
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5732299) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Grogg, Adam) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/12/2018) (zjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?