MADISON et al v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al

Plaintiff: KAI TEASE and AUSAR MADISON
Defendant: Kevin Nickelberry, Howard Univeristy and HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02352
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 Case Remanded to Superior Court re #6 Order Remanding Case to State Court. (ztd)
October 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Conference in Chambers held on 10/26/2018. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
October 26, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER. This case is hereby remanded to the Superior Court for the District of Columbia. See attached document for details. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/26/18. (lctnm1)
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 10/26/2018 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
October 25, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a telephone conference on Friday, October 26, 2018 at 2 p.m. in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/25/2018. (lctnm1)
October 23, 2018 Case Stayed. (hmc)
October 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part the Defendants' #5 Consent Motion to STAY and dismissing its Motion for Extension as moot. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed to allow a telephone conference to be scheduled. Details forthcoming. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/23/18. (ltnm1)
October 20, 2018 5 MOTION to Stay , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, KEVIN NICKELBERRY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Zachary)
October 16, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/16/18. (lctnm1)
October 15, 2018 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrdj)
October 15, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, KEVIN NICKELBERRY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, KEVIN NICKELBERRY. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KEVIN NICKELBERRY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY.(Shapiro, Zachary)
October 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 006902 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5733258 filed by Howard Univeristy, Kevin Nickelberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DCSC Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit DCSC Notice)(Shapiro, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADISON et al v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Nickelberry
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Univeristy
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAI TEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUSAR MADISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?