ROSS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: EDWARD ROSS
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02359
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Morgan Neinast on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Neinast, Lindsay)
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's #3 Motion due by 12/7/2018. (hmc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order advising the Plaintiff to respond to the Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss on or before December 7, 2018, or the Court may deem matter as conceded. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/7/2018. (lctnm3)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/16/2018. (lctnm3)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Allen, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2018CA006578B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5734362 filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party, #4 Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Superior Court Documents)(Allen, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: William F. Allen
Represented By: Lindsay Morgan Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?