MANGAL v. BRENNAN

Plaintiff: RAVIN A MANGAL and RAVIN A. MANGAL
Defendant: MEGAN J. BRENNAN
Case Number: 1:2018cv02363
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of MEGAN J. BRENNAN (Sroka, Scott)
October 30, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2018. (Kruger, Susan)
October 30, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2018. (Kruger, Susan)
October 30, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MEGAN J. BRENNAN served on 10/24/2018 (Kruger, Susan) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct party served (jf).
October 15, 2018 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MEGAN J. BRENNAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against MEGAN J. BRENNAN with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5735860) filed by RAVIN A MANGAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons Brennan)(Kruger, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANGAL v. BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVIN A MANGAL
Represented By: Susan Laiken Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVIN A. MANGAL
Represented By: Susan Laiken Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN J. BRENNAN
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?