WELLS FARGO BANK, NA v. WILSON
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
Defendant: ZENOBIA WILSON
Case Number: 1:2018cv02381
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Defendant to respond by November 19, 2018 to #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/31/18. (lcrc1)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (tth)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Cohen, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2017CA006164R(RP). (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095003) filed by ZENOBIA WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth); Modified text on 10/18/2018 (tth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA v. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZENOBIA WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
Represented By: David Chen
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?