KEISTER v. AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE et al

Plaintiff: KIM KEISTER
Defendant: AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE and AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02385
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE (Davis, Alison)
December 10, 2018 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
November 29, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO..(Downey, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/10/2018. (gdf)
November 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that AARP Benefits Committee shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/10/2018. Any further requests for extensions of time must comply with the Court's General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases (ECF No.2). Counsel is specifically directed to Section 5(b) of the Order (requiring motions for extension of time to be filed "at least two (2) business days prior to expiration of the deadline"). Any future motions for extension of time that do not comply with these requirements may be summarily denied. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/26/2018. (lckbj2)
November 26, 2018 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint by AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
November 14, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Aetna Life Insurance Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/14/2018. (lckbj1)
November 14, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullen, Kathleen)
November 12, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: On November 12, 2018, the parties filed a #7 Stipulation that memorializes an agreement they have reached regarding the schedule for defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company to respond to the complaint in this matter, which includes a line for this Court's signature. This Court does not to honor stipulations for extensions of time. See #2 Appendix to General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases Before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson, Para. 5(b). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that that parties #7 Stipulation is STRICKEN. Should any defendant desire an extension of time to respond to the complaint, it must file a motion that complies with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1) and 6(b), and with this Court's #2 General Order and Guidelines. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/12/2018. (lckbj1)
November 12, 2018 7 STRIKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 11/12/18.....STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Mullen, Kathleen) Modified on 11/13/2018 (zgdf).
November 12, 2018 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Mullen, Kathleen)
November 12, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Mullen on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Mullen, Kathleen)
November 12, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Downey on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Downey, Brian)
October 19, 2018 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE, AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2nd, #2 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 19, 2018 2 Featured Case GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/19/2018. (lckbj1)
October 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd)
October 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE, AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5742227) filed by KIM KEISTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Clark, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEISTER v. AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM KEISTER
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARP BENEFITS COMMITTEE
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Downey
Represented By: Kathleen A. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?