VELASQUEZ MOLINA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Plaintiff: EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DANIEL BIBLE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ANDREW HURON, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02392
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2018 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. Motion taken under advisement. Government shall inform the court in writing by 12/17/18 as to whether a supplemental declaration will be filed. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to Offer into Evidence by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Toll, Joshua)
December 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are reminded that they shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff's motion [Dkt. No. 2] for a temporary restraining order -- which the Court will now treat as a motion for a preliminary injunction -- on December 14, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 13, 2018. (MA)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #17 Defendants Opp To Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murley, Nicole) Modified to add link on 12/14/2018 (znmw).
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23)(McNerney, Martin) Modified event title on 12/12/2018 (znmw).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's emergency motion #12 to stay. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 4, 2018. (lcplf1)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Defendants by DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Murley, Nicole)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Toll, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018 by 5:00 p.m. (gdf)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Toll, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Following a hearing earlier today on plaintiff's emergency motion #12 to stay, defendants have voluntarily agreed to stay plaintiff's removal until midnight on Tuesday, December 4, 2018. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report by 5:00 p.m. on December 4, 2018 notifying the Court of any relevant developments in this action or the action pending before Judge Sabraw. Accordingly, the Court will hold in abeyance its decision on plaintiff's emergency motion pending review of the parties' forthcoming joint status report. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 30, 2018. (lcplf1)
November 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2018. Oral argument held on motion to stay. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (tj)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear by telephone for a hearing on plaintiff's emergency motion #12 to stay removal at 3:30 p.m. on November 30, 2018. Once all parties are on the line, the parties shall call Chambers at 202-354-3490. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 30, 2018. (lcplf1)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Stay by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Toll, Joshua)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #10 Stipulation was entered in error per counsel and said pleading is refiled as docket entry no. #11 . (ztd)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Toll, Joshua)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .STIPULATION by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (McNerney, Martin) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ztd).
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Newcomb Murley on behalf of All Defendants (Murley, Nicole)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toll, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Objection to the Proposed Settlement in Ms. L. v. Sessions, et al. by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Toll, Joshua)
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/29/2018 (tj)
October 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' joint stipulation #6 , defendants have voluntarily agreed to stay plaintiff's removal from the United States until at least October 31, 2018. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that plaintiff's motion #2 for a temporary restraining order shall be held in abeyance until further order of the Court. On or before October 29, 2018, the parties shall file a status report advising the Court whether an additional stay of removal will be granted to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toll, Joshua)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of All Defendants (Braswell, Marina)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. Case related to Case No. 18-CV-2096-PLF, 18-CV-02231-PLF. (Toll, Joshua)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Toll, Joshua)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5744178) filed by EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Toll, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VELASQUEZ MOLINA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HURON
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EGLA ARELY VELASQUEZ MOLINA
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?