HOLLOWAY v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: DERRICK HOLLOWAY and DERRICK O. HOLLOWAY
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02402
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Referring Judge: G Michael Harvey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by DERRICK O. HOLLOWAY (Beiser, Jonathan) Modified on 11/8/2018 (ztd).
October 23, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management. (ad)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management up to and excluding trial. Parties are reminded, pursuant to LCvR 73.1, that this action may be referred for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties. Consent of the District Court Judge is not necessary. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is referred to a Magistrate Judge, beginning immediately; the Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office and the appointed Magistrate Judge will schedule a conference with the parties as soon as possible; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding judge and the Magistrate Judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/23/2018. (lccrc1)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(jf)
October 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5746964) filed by DERRICK O. HOLLOWAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Beiser, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLOWAY v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK HOLLOWAY
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK O. HOLLOWAY
Represented By: Jonathan Steven Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?