BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR, II
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH, INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MCLEOD HEALTH, ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, PENN STATE HEALTH, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, ORLANDO HEALTH, INC., UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS and ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02404
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER consolidating case with Albert Einstein Healthcare Network v. Azar, 1:17-cv-1134-ABJ. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/13/18. (DMK)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Nonobjection to Consolidation by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
November 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet, confer and notify the Court by 11/15/2018 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case: Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. (jth)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by November 15, 2018 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/1/18. (DMK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/30/2018 (Keough, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
October 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exhibits to Complaint by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH, MCLEOD HEALTH, ORLANDO HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES, ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. re #1 Complaint,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Keough, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH, MCLEOD HEALTH, ORLANDO HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES, ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1134. (Keough, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH, MCLEOD HEALTH, ORLANDO HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES, ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Keough, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5749107) filed by ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, ORLANDO HEALTH, INC., FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., MCLEOD HEALTH, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES, INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM, PENN STATE HEALTH, THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO, ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Keough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGALLS HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLEOD HEALTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL AT THE VINTAGE
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENN STATE HEALTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT LOUDON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION-SUGAR LAND
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT CCMC, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI OHIO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKFORD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?