CARREIRA v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES Featured Case

Plaintiff Christina Carriera challenged the denial of her employment-based immigrant visa petition by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services on the grounds that she is not an alien of extraordinary ability under 8 USC Section 1153(b)(1)(A) even though she has won gold and silver medals in national and international competitions in junior ice dance with her partner Anthony Pomomarenko.

Plaintiff: Christina Carreira
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2018cv02406
Filed: October 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2019. (zjd)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. This case shall be held in abeyance for 125 days, to April 8, 2019, at which time the parties will file a joint status report with the Court or dismiss the litigation, as appropriate. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/04/2018. (lcapm3)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Go, Samuel)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Opposition shall be due sixty (60) days after Defendant answers the operative complaint. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/13/2018. (lcapm3)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Go, Samuel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Go on behalf of All Defendants (Go, Samuel)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
October 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
October 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRISTINA CARREIRA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael)
October 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5750178) filed by CHRISTINA CARREIRA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USCIS, #3 Summons USDOJ, #4 Summons US ATTY OFFICE, #5 Exhibit Initial Petition(1), #6 Exhibit Initial Petition(2), #7 Exhibit Initial Petition(3), #8 Exhibit Request for Evidence, #9 Exhibit Response to Request for Evidence, #10 Exhibit Decision)(Piston, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/23/2018) (jf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARREIRA v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Carreira
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?