GOSAIN v. REPUBLIC OF INDIA et al

Plaintiff: RAJIV SHAH GOSAIN
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA and REPUBLIC OF INDIA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02427
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Since this case was transferred to this Court from the Southern District of New York, the docket does not reflect that Plaintiff has made any attempts to serve Defendants in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than January 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall either file proof of service with the Court or file a status report apprising the Court of Plaintiff's attempts to serve Defendants as instructed by 28 U.S.C. 1608. Failure to do so may warrant dismissal of the action for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/17/2018. (lctjk2)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07236. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On September 26, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why venue is proper in this District. (As further set forth in this Order.) Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/12/2018) (cf) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, by October 10, 2018, why this action should not be transferred. If Plaintiff fails to respond within the time allowed, or fails to show that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York and that the action should not be transferred in the interest of justice, the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/26/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Official Liquidator of the Ministry of Corporate Affairs of the Republic of India. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Official Liquidator of the Ministry of Corporate Affairs of the Republic of India. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic of India. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ministry of Corporate Affairs of the Republic of India. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Elias N. Sakalis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:9607; Dollar Demand 25,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1330; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Elias N. Sakalis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rajiv Shah Gosain; Republic of India; Ministry of Corporate Affairs of the Republic of India; Office of the Official Liquidator of the Ministry of Corporate Affairs of the Republic of India. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Elias N. Sakalis. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Ministry of Corporate Affairs, Office of the Official Liquidator, Republic of India. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain.(Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Elias N. Sakalis to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is titled "Summons". Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/20/2018. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Republic of India. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain. (Sakalis, Elias) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Ministry of Corporate Affairs, Office of the Official Liquidator, Republic of India. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15435633)Document filed by Rajiv Shah Gosain.(Sakalis, Elias) Modified on 8/13/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOSAIN v. REPUBLIC OF INDIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE OFFICIAL LIQUIDATOR OF THE MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINISTRY OF CORPORATE AFFAIRS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC OF INDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJIV SHAH GOSAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?