HURRY v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JUSTINE HURRY
Defendant: JOHN R JILOVEC, HILLARY R HOSKINS, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, HILARY L. HOSKINS and JOHN R. JILOVEC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02435
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 11/14/2018; HILARY L. HOSKINS served on 11/13/2018; JOHN R. JILOVEC served on 11/13/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/9/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/8/2019.) (Smith, Joseph)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, HILARY L. HOSKINS, JOHN R. JILOVEC, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/29/2018. (lcrdm2, )
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5756678) filed by JUSTINE HURRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Notice of Change in Control (9.27.2017), #2 Exhibit B - Initial IBFR (9.27.2017), #3 Exhibit C - 12.21.2017 Ltr from Klinkhardt to Hoskins (FDIC), #4 Exhibit D - 01.12.2018 Ltr from Jilovec (FDIC) to Klinkhardt, #5 Exhibit E - Updated Interagency Notice of Change in Control, #6 Exhibit F - 03.23.2018 Ltr from Jilovec (FDIC) to Klinkhardt, #7 Exhibit G - 03.30.2018 Ltr from Klinkhardt to Hoskins (FDIC), #8 Exhibit H - 06.01.2018 Ltr from Jilovec (FDIC) to Klinkhardt, #9 Exhibit I - 06.22.2018 Ltr From Klinkhardt to Jilovec (FDIC), #10 Exhibit J - 07.02.2018 Ltr from Baris to Hoskins (FDIC), #11 Exhibit K - 07.24.2018 Ltr from Jilovec (FDIC) to Klinkhardt, #12 Exhibit L - 08.08.2018 Ltr from Baris to Jilovec (FDIC), #13 Exhibit M - 09.10.2018 Ltr from Baris to Jilovec (FDIC), #14 Exhibit N - 09.19.2018 Ltr from Jilovec (FDIC) to Baris, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons FDIC, #17 Summons John Jilovec, #18 Summons Hilary Hoskins, #19 Summons Attorney General of the U.S., #20 Summons Office of the U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Smith, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HURRY v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R JILOVEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLARY R HOSKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILARY L. HOSKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. JILOVEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTINE HURRY
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?