FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. CANDELORI, JR. et al
Plaintiff: FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., KEITH COSTANZO, JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT and MICHAEL CASSIDY
Defendant: WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR., GEORGE GALIS, TIMOTHY MAITLAND, ROBERT KUCHERAN, HARRY ZELL, KENNETH RIGMAIDEN, MARK ZEVERN, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES and MARK VAN ZEVERN
Case Number: 1:2018cv02476
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint due by 1/11/2019. (hmc)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Upon consideration of the Defendants' #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, it is hereby ordered that the Defendants shall file any response to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/19/2018.(lctnm2)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR, GEORGE GALIS, ROBERT KUCHERAN, TIMOTHY MAITLAND, KENNETH RIGMAIDEN, MARK VAN ZEVERN, HARRY ZELL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Griffin, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by April Pullium on behalf of WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR, GEORGE GALIS, ROBERT KUCHERAN, TIMOTHY MAITLAND, KENNETH RIGMAIDEN, MARK VAN ZEVERN, HARRY ZELL (Pullium, April)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Kolick, Jr on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES (Kolick, Joseph) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/21/2018) (zjf).
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KEITH COSTANZO, MICHAEL CASSIDY, FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT. WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; GEORGE GALIS waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; ROBERT KUCHERAN waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; TIMOTHY MAITLAND waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; KENNETH RIGMAIDEN waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; MARK VAN ZEVERN waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018; HARRY ZELL waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018. (Hashmall, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KEITH COSTANZO, MICHAEL CASSIDY, FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Hashmall, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hashmall, David)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Griffin on behalf of WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR, GEORGE GALIS, ROBERT KUCHERAN, TIMOTHY MAITLAND, KENNETH RIGMAIDEN, MARK VAN ZEVERN, HARRY ZELL (Griffin, Richard)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ERRATA by MICHAEL CASSIDY, KEITH COSTANZO, FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT #1 Complaint, filed by JEROME HABER, KEITH COSTANZO, TODD NUGENT, FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., MICHAEL CASSIDY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Isenman, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys David L. Hashmall and Michael G. McNally shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2018. (lctnm2) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit event title (hmc).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2018. (lctnm2)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR, GEORGE GALIS, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES, ROBERT KUCHERAN, TIMOTHY MAITLAND, KENNETH RIGMAIDEN, HARRY ZELL, MARK ZEVERN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael G. McNally, :Firm- Felhaber Larson, :Address- 220 South 6th, Street, Suite 2200, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 339-6321. Fax No. - (612) 338-0535 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5761719. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL CASSIDY, KEITH COSTANZO, FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenman, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David L. Hashmall, :Firm- Felhaber Larson, :Address- 220 South 6th, Street, Suite 2200, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 339-6321. Fax No. - (612) 338-0535 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5761716. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenman, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Riffee on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Riffee, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Isenman, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 11/5/2018.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration)(Isenman, Michael) Modified on 10/26/2018 (zmd); Modified text on 11/15/2018 (ztth).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5761663) filed by FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC., MICHAEL CASSIDY, KEITH COSTANZO, JEROME HABER, TODD NUGENT . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Isenman, Michael) Modified on 10/26/2018 (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. CANDELORI, JR. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: Michael K. Isenman
Represented By: Michael George McNally
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH COSTANZO
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: Michael K. Isenman
Represented By: Michael George McNally
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME HABER
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: Michael K. Isenman
Represented By: Michael George McNally
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD NUGENT
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: Michael K. Isenman
Represented By: Michael George McNally
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CASSIDY
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: Michael K. Isenman
Represented By: Michael George McNally
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM CANDELORI, JR.
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE GALIS
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY MAITLAND
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT KUCHERAN
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY ZELL
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH RIGMAIDEN
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ZEVERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES
Represented By: Joseph Edward Kolick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK VAN ZEVERN
Represented By: Richard Griffin
Represented By: April Pullium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?