STATEWIDE BONDING, INC et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC and NEXUS SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: JODY M. PRESCOTT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, RONALD D. VITIELLO and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Case Number: 1:2018cv02519
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/17/2019. (znbn)
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Campbell, Rhonda)
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018. (nbn)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Consent #25 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that they shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by January 17, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/11/2018. (lcjeb2)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's conference call, the Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint by December 14, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/11/2018. (lcjeb1)
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER. (tth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #21 MOTION to Strike re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order supplemental briefing filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III., and 24 RESPONSE re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Williams, Mario) Modified text and links on 12/11/2018 (tth).
December 4, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge James E. Boasberg. (lsj)
December 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2018 re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Order forthcoming from chambers. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (zjd)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs' #17 TRO Motion is DENIED; 2) Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Declaratory Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as superseded by their Amended Complaint; and 3) The parties shall appear for a telephone conference call on December 11, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss further proceedings in the case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/4/2018. (lcjeb2)
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #19 NOTICE supplemental briefing filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (See Docket Entry #21 to view document) (tth) Modified link on 12/12/2018 (znmw).
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike re #19 NOTICE supplemental briefing filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Campbell, Rhonda); Modified event on 12/11/2018 (tth). Modified link on 12/12/2018 (znmw).
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hudson, #2 Declaration Monette)(Campbell, Rhonda)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplement to TRO Motion by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Notice to AAO, #2 Exhibit Decl. Eric Schneider, #3 Exhibit Decl. Big Marco Bonding, #4 Exhibit Decl. Statewide Bonding, #5 Exhibit Email from legal advisor, #6 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts, #7 Exhibit Proof of Cancellation of invoice regarding untimely appeal)(Williams, Mario)
November 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Opposition due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/3/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER (Campbell, Rhonda)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry in WDVA Case)(Williams, Mario)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 ERRATA by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC #14 Amended Complaint, filed by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Prescott Email, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Letter to Prescott, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 Letter to Shoreman, #5 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Williams, Mario)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Now that the Government has been served, Plaintiff must comply with LCvR 7(m) when filing non-dispositive motions. Since it has not, the Court ORDERS that its #15 Motion to File Under Seal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any future motion should also contain more than one sentence as a justification for sealing given the presumption that filings will be public. The Court also ORDERS that Plaintiff's earlier #3 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot given the filing of the Amended Complaint. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/2018. (lcjeb2)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's conference call, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The Government's Opposition to Plaintiffs' TRO is due by 5:00 p.m. on December 3, 2018; and 2) A hearing on the TRO will occur on December 4, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/2018. (lcjeb1)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Prescott Email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter to Prescott, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Letter to Shoreman, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER with Jury Demand filed by NEXUS SERVICES, INC., BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons for Vitiello and Whitaker)(Williams, Mario)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2019. (Williams, Mario)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/18. (Williams, Mario)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/9/2018 (Williams, Mario)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/9/2018 (Williams, Mario)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' #9 Motion to Expedite is DENIED. Although they have not even filed proof of service on Defendants, they seek a schedule that is far more expedited than even a preliminary injunction. There is no basis for such request. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2018. (lcjeb2)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Mandamus Claim by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Letter from Shoreman, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Letter from Prescott, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Email from Williams, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario). Added MOTION for Hearing on 11/13/2018 (znmw).
November 8, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of MARIO BERNARD WILLIAMS. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2018. (lcjeb2)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DALLAS S. LEPIERRE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2018. (lcjeb2)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02115-JEB. (Shoreman, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dallas S. LePierre, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5780449. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dallas S. LePierre)(Shoreman, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5780427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
November 1, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Bond Management Handbook, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shoreman, John). Added MOTION for Mandamus Relief on 11/13/2018 (znmw).
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Prescott Email, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Letter to Prescott, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Letter to Shoreman)(Shoreman, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 15-2115. (zsb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5766359) filed by NEXUS SERVICES, INC., BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Shoreman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATEWIDE BONDING, INC et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario Bernanrd Williams
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE DONOVAN
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario Bernanrd Williams
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATEWIDE BONDING, INC
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario Bernanrd Williams
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEXUS SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario Bernanrd Williams
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY M. PRESCOTT
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?