DEL CARMEN GUERRA v. JW LLC et al

Plaintiff: FLOR DEL CARMEN GUERRA
Defendant: BECKY M WOO, JW LLC and BECKY M. WOO
Case Number: 1:2018cv02530
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BECKY M. WOO served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
December 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/16/2019. (znbn)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that they shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 16, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/13/2018. (lcjeb2)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JW LLC (DiSalvo, Lindsay)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by JW LLC, BECKY M. WOO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiSalvo, Lindsay)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Bennett Schwartz on behalf of JW LLC, BECKY M. WOO (Schwartz, Jordan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay A. DiSalvo on behalf of JW LLC, BECKY M. WOO (DiSalvo, Lindsay)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to JW LLC, BECKY M. WOO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
November 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5770779) filed by FLOR DEL CARMEN GUERRA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for JW LLC, #3 Summons for Becky M. Woo)(Kurzyna, Mariusz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEL CARMEN GUERRA v. JW LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECKY M WOO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JW LLC
Represented By: Lindsay A. DiSalvo
Represented By: Jordan Bennett Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECKY M. WOO
Represented By: Lindsay A. DiSalvo
Represented By: Jordan Bennett Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOR DEL CARMEN GUERRA
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?