ALVAREZ et al v. CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC. et al

Plaintiff: TOMAS ALVAREZ and ERIKA AQUINO
Defendant: GABRIEL MONTECINOS, EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC and CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02540
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC by CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prosen, Lawrence)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendant Capitol Drywall, Inc.'s #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant Capitol Drywall, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' complaint on or before December 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2018. (lcdlf1)
December 4, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prosen, Lawrence)
November 30, 2018 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018 (Metz, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018; GABRIEL MONTECINOS served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018 (Metz, Kevin)
November 13, 2018 7 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC. (tth)
November 8, 2018 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC filed by TOMAS ALVAREZ, ERIKA AQUINO. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Metz, Kevin); Modified text per counsel on 11/13/2018 (tth).
November 8, 2018 5 ERRATA to Correct Case Caption by TOMAS ALVAREZ, ERIKA AQUINO. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Collective Action Complaint, #2 Corrected Summons for East Coast Developers,LLC)(Metz, Kevin)
November 8, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Adlai Katz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Katz, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC., EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC, GABRIEL MONTECINOS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
November 2, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin H. Metz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Metz, Kevin)
November 2, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC., EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC, GABRIEL MONTECINOS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5772285) filed by TOMAS ALVAREZ, ERIKA AQUINO. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Capitol Drywall, Inc., #5 Summons East Coast Developers, LLC, #6 Summons Gabriel Montecinos)(Metz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALVAREZ et al v. CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL MONTECINOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST COAST DEVELOPERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITOL DRYWALL, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Prosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMAS ALVAREZ
Represented By: Kevin H. Metz
Represented By: Daniel Adlai Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIKA AQUINO
Represented By: Kevin H. Metz
Represented By: Daniel Adlai Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?