MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02555
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to be included when issuing subpoena pursuant to #6 Order granting Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/02/2019. (lccrc3)
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/1/2019 (lsj)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/2018. (lccrc3)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC re Order, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 12/11/2018. (lsj)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court invites the Plaintiff to file a brief, not to exceed five pages, on or before December 11, 2018, addressing the issues raised by the Honorable Judge Royce Lamberth in his November 16, 2018 Memorandum Opinion in Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, 18-cv-1425, available at https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/show_public_doc?2018cv1425-5. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2018. (lccrc3)
November 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Hoppe, Jon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5776332) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Jon A. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?