CHAVEZ v. Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC

Plaintiff: JOSE CHAVEZ
Defendant: Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02558
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018 (Greenberg, Gregg)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/8/2018. (lcrdm3, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5777339) filed by JOSE CHAVEZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAVEZ v. Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y&S ENTERPRISES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CHAVEZ
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?