WARRICK et al v. TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: BRIAN WARRICK, JUANITA CALDWELL, DAVONN LANE and DAVID RICH
Defendant: EVERAL ORNAL CAMPBELL, TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. and CORNELIUS L. JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2018cv02571
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Because a "corporation cannot represent itself and cannot appear pro se," Lennon v. McClory, 3 F. Supp. 2d 1461, 1462 n.1 (D.D.C. 1998), the Court grants the motion only as to Defendant Everal Campbell. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Campbell shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by January 15, 2019. The other Defendants' deadlines to respond to the complaint remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/23/2018. (lctjk3)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EVERAL ORNAL CAMPBELL, CORNELIUS L. JOHNSON, TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. "Leave to File Granted" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/21/2018. (tth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 11/25/2018, answer due 12/16/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EVERAL ORNAL CAMPBELL served on 11/25/2018, answer due 12/16/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CORNELIUS L. JOHNSON served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EVERAL ORNAL CAMPBELL, CORNELIUS L. JOHNSON, TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrdj)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5781646) filed by BRIAN WARRICK, DAVID RICH, JUANITA CALDWELL, DAVONN LANE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARRICK et al v. TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WARRICK
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA CALDWELL
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVONN LANE
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RICH
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERAL ORNAL CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACTICAL SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORNELIUS L. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?