HARVEY v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: JANET HARVEY
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02574
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/3/2018. (zmd)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt D. Campbell, Jr on behalf of JANET HARVEY (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LCvR 83.2(g))(zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Heuer Levy on behalf of JANET HARVEY (zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer F. Mezey on behalf of JANET HARVEY (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LCvR 83.2(g))(zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JANET HARVEY (zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by JANET HARVEY.(zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/9/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVEY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET HARVEY
Represented By: Jonathan Heuer Levy
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Curt D. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?