AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02582
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' #8 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report five days after Congress restores appropriations to the Department of Justice or on January 25, 2019, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 4, 2019. (lcdlf1)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart)
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. (jl)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 14, 2018. (lcdlf1)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Haynes, Fred)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 11/19/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2018. (See Docket Entry #5 to view document) (jf)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/13/2018) (zjd).
November 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE - Amended Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re #1 Complaint (Wood, Hart)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5784628) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Wood, Hart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Hart W. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?