MCCLELLAN v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK

Plaintiff: SANDRA MCCLELLAN
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02583
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Any supplementation of disclosures and responses must be served on or before 11/27/2019. (jth)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. After a status conference held on January 4, 2019 in Courtroom 3, and in light of the meet and confer statement submitted by the parties pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, it is ORDERED that (1) initial disclosures must be served on or before January 23, 2019; (2) motions for joinder of additional parties or amendment of pleadings must be filed by March 4, 2019; (3) plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures regarding experts must be served on or before August 7, 2019; (4) defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures regarding experts must be served on or before October 7, 2019; (5) plaintiff's rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures regarding experts must be served on or before November 7, 2019; (6) any supplementation of disclosures and responses must be served on or before November 27, 2019; (7) all discovery must be completed no later than December 4, 2019; (8) a status conference is scheduled for December 6, 2019, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 3; (9) defendant must file any motion for summary judgment by January 6, 2020; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, to be supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, will be due on February 5, 2020; defendant's reply and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment, if necessary, will be due on February 19, 2020; and plaintiff's reply to the opposition to its cross-motion for summary judgment, if necessary, will be due on February 28, 2020. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2019. (lcabj2) Modified on 1/6/2019 to reflect that this is a "paper" not "minute" order (jth).
January 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 1/4/2019, Scheduling Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Engel, Jason)
December 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: At the request of Counsel for the Plaintiff who indicates the consent of Counsel for the Defendant, the Initial Scheduling Conference presently set for 12/21/2018 at 9:30 AM is reset for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 is now due by 12/28/2018. (jth)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave of Jason C. MacFetters to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/3/18. (DMK)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason C. MacFetters, :Firm- Rome, Arata, Baxley & Stelly, LLC, :Address- 650 Poydras Street, Poydras Center, Suite 2017, New Orleans, LA 70130. Phone No. - (504) 522-9980. Fax No. - (504) 522-9971 jmacfetters@romearata.com Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5819103. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANDRA MCCLELLAN (Weisbaum, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 12/14/2018. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g., "60 days after the entry of the scheduling order"). Counsel are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of court appearances. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/2018. (jth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION.(Engel, Jason)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Weisbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weisbaum, Steven)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
November 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal, (Engel, Jason)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Bottiglieri on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK (Bottiglieri, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation's Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK (Engel, Jason)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 007114 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5784660 filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Engel, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLELLAN v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA MCCLELLAN
Represented By: Steven Mark Weisbaum
Represented By: Jason C. MacFetters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK
Represented By: Joseph John Bottiglieri
Represented By: Jason R. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph John Bottiglieri
Represented By: Jason R. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?