KANRAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al v. NIELSEN et al

Plaintiff: SUNDAR KANNAN and Kanrad Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: LOREN K. MILLER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, DONALD NEUFELD, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02584
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNDAR KANNAN, KANRAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #4 Order . (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNDAR KANNAN, KANRAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA & and other Defendants. (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LOREN K. MILLER served on 11/28/2018 (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD NEUFELD served on 11/26/2018 (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. L. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 11/26/2018 (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 11/26/2018 (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIRSTJEN NIELSEN served on 11/26/2018 (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/2018. (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/25/2019. (Rosen, Adam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA, LOREN K. MILLER, DONALD NEUFELD, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY (Campbell, Rhonda)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/13/2018. (lcrdm2, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Kanrad Technologies, Inc. (Rosen, Adam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA, LOREN K. MILLER, DONALD NEUFELD, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5784868) filed by Kanrad Technologies, Inc., SUNDAR KANNAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons for Civil Process Clerk, #16 Summons for Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary, U.S. Department ofHomeland Security, #17 Summons for Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U.S. Attorney General, #18 Summons for Christopher Wray, Director, FBI, #19 Summons for L. Francis Cissna, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, #20 Summons for Donald Neufeld, Associate Director, Service Center Operations, Directorate, USCIS, #21 Summons for Loren K. Miller, Director, Nebraska Service Center, USCIS)(Rosen, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KANRAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN K. MILLER
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD NEUFELD
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNDAR KANNAN
Represented By: Adam Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanrad Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?