GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY

Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Defendant: COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02606
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 7 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY (Hendry, Melanie)
December 3, 2018 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2018. (Burday, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/2018. (Burday, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY served on 11/26/2018 (Burday, Joshua)
November 15, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, )
November 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burday, Joshua)
November 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5787220) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Summons)(Burday, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Represented By: Joshua Hart Burday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?