CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

A case in which Cable News Network (CNN) claims the White House overstepped in revoking the press credentials of reporter Jim Acosta.

Plaintiff: ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA and CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Defendant: JOHN F. KELLY, JOHN DOE, WILLIAM SHINE, RANDOLPH D. ALLES, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS and DONALD J. TRUMP
Amicus Curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02610
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 30 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Motion for Leave to Proceed Amicus Curiae, Motion for Reconsideration or Dismissal for Want of Jurisdiction. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File DENIED, Case is closed." Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/4/2018. (tth)
November 27, 2018 29 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Brief of Ryan A. Starzyk a Private Citizen as Amicus Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs' Motions for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File DENIED because case is closed." Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/27/2018. (tth)
November 19, 2018 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Boutrous, Theodore)
November 19, 2018 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eli Segal, :Firm- Pepper Hamilton LLP, :Address- 3000 Two Logan Sq 18th and Arch Streets Philadelphia Pa 19103. Phone No. - 215-981-4000. Fax No. - 215-981-4750 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5799170. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WHITE HOUSE CORRESPONDENTS' ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehner, George)
November 19, 2018 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy B. Ginensky, :Firm- Pepper Hamilton LLP, :Address- 3000 Two Logan Sq 18th and Arch Streets Philadelphia Pa 19103. Phone No. - 215-981-4000. Fax No. - 215-981-4750 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5799150. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WHITE HOUSE CORRESPONDENTS' ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehner, George)
November 19, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Status Report. Defendants shall file their status report in response to the Court's November 16, 2018 Minute Order by 6:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/19/2018. (lctjk3)
November 19, 2018 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Status Report and Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Status Report by RANDOLPH D. ALLES, JOHN DOE, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS, JOHN F. KELLY, WILLIAM SHINE, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
November 19, 2018 24 EMERGENCY MOTION for Briefing Schedule, MOTION for Hearing by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (See Docket Entry 23 to view document). (tth)
November 19, 2018 23 Emergency STATUS REPORT by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57, # 2 Exhibit 58, # 3 Exhibit 59)(Boutrous, Theodore)
November 18, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 19 Memorandum in Opposition, was entered in error as a separate docket entry; it has been added to Docket Entry 18 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and will be refiled when the motion is granted. (znmw)
November 16, 2018 22 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 11-16-18; Page Numbers: 1-19; Date of Issuance: 11-16-18; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2019.(Miller, Timothy)
November 16, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of this morning's Oral Ruling on Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report proposing how they would like to proceed in this case by 3:00 p.m. on November 19, 2018. The status report shall include any request to set a status conference during the week of November 19, 2018, and any briefing schedule to which the parties have agreed. The parties shall also indicate in the status report whether they agree to consolidate briefing on the motion for a preliminary injunction with the merits. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/16/2018. (lctjk3)
November 16, 2018 Minute Entry and Order for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing continued and held on 11/16/2018. Oral Ruling GRANTING 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for the reasons stated on the record in open court. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
November 16, 2018 20 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 11-14-18; Page Numbers: 1-102; Date of Issuance: 11-16-18; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2019.(Miller, Timothy)
November 15, 2018 19 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition filed by One America News Network. (Fein, Bruce) Modified on 11/18/2018 (znmw).
November 15, 2018 18 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by One America News Network (Fein, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2018: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief) (znmw).
November 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Oral Ruling on Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on November 15, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED until 10:00 a.m. on November 16, 2018, in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/15/2018. (lctjk3)
November 15, 2018 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by WHITE HOUSE CORRESPONDENTS' ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit / Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehner, George)
November 14, 2018 21 AMICUS BRIEF by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (tth)
November 14, 2018 17 Plaintiff's Exhibit List in Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2018 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (kh)
November 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2018 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. Oral Ruling on Motion continued to 11/15/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
November 14, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Defendants have not opposed this motion within the time set by the Court, and the Court finds that the motion complies with LCivR 7(o)(2). The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press may file its brief as Amicus Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs' Motions for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/14/2018. (lctjk3)
November 14, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan L. Backer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/14/2018. (lctjk3)
November 14, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hendry Baer on behalf of All Defendants (Baer, Michael)
November 14, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James)
November 14, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of RANDOLPH D. ALLES, JOHN DOE, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS, JOHN F. KELLY, WILLIAM SHINE, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Borson, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 12 Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by RANDOLPH D. ALLES, JOHN DOE, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS, JOHN F. KELLY, WILLIAM SHINE, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Baer, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file any response to Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by 11:00 a.m. on November 14, 2018. Defendants shall also file their opposition, if any, to the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press's 6 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by that time. It is further ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order will be held at 3:30 p.m. on November 14, 2018, in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/13/2018. (lctjk3)
November 13, 2018 11 ERRATA by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan L. Backer, :Firm- Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection, :Address- 600 New Jersey Ave NW Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-662-9042. Filing fee $ filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Declaration)(Geltzer, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anne M. Champion is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/13/2018. (lctjk3)
November 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua S. Lipshutz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/13/2018. (lctjk3)
November 13, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anne M. Champion, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 200 Park Avenue, New York, New York 10166. Phone No. - 212-351-5361. Fax No. - 212-351-5281 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5788637. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
November 13, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua S. Lipshutz, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW. Phone No. - 202-955-8217. Fax No. - 202-530-9614 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5788597. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
November 13, 2018 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. identifying Other Affiliate AT&T INC. for CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (jf)
November 13, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore B. Olson on behalf of ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (jf)
November 13, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Geltzer, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan L. Backer, :Firm- Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection, :Address- 600 New Jersey Ave NW Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-662-9042. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5788455. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Geltzer, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (See Docket Entries 2 3 for Exhibits)(jf)
November 13, 2018 3 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit 17, # 12 Exhibit 18, # 13 Exhibit 19, # 14 Exhibit 20, # 15 Exhibit 21, # 16 Exhibit 22, # 17 Exhibit 23, # 18 Exhibit 24, # 19 Exhibit 25, # 20 Exhibit 26, # 21 Exhibit 27, # 22 Exhibit 28, # 23 Exhibit 29, # 24 Exhibit 30, # 25 Exhibit 31, # 26 Exhibit 32, # 27 Exhibit 33, # 28 Exhibit 34, # 29 Exhibit 35, # 30 Exhibit 36, # 31 Exhibit 37, # 32 Exhibit 38, # 33 Exhibit 39, # 34 Exhibit 40, # 35 Exhibit 41, # 36 Exhibit 42, # 37 Exhibit 43, # 38 Exhibit 44, # 39 Exhibit 45, # 40 Exhibit 46, # 41 Exhibit 47, # 42 Exhibit 48, # 43 Exhibit 49, # 44 Exhibit 50, # 45 Exhibit 51, # 46 Exhibit 52, # 47 Exhibit 53, # 48 Exhibit 54)(jf)
November 13, 2018 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 65.1 Statement, # 3 Declaration of Sam Donaldson, # 4 Declaration of Same Feist, # 5 Declaration of Todd Joseph Gillman, # 6 Declaration of Jim Acosta, # 7 Declaration of Theodore J. Boutrous, # 8 Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 5, # 13 Text of Proposed Order) (jf)
November 13, 2018 Summons (6) Issued as to RANDOLPH D. ALLES, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS, JOHN F. KELLY, WILLIAM SHINE, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (jf)
November 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against RANDOLPH D. ALLES, JOHN DOE, SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS, JOHN F. KELLY, WILLIAM SHINE, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095426) with Jury Demand filed by ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABILIO JAMES ACOSTA
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Anne M. Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Anne M. Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SHINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH D. ALLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH HUCKABEE SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Joshua Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?