SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, FRANK A. MAXSON, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, THOMAS LAMARTINA, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER, DAVID HUERTA, LAPHONZA BUTLER, EDWARD J. MANKO and SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Defendant: TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC., NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. and FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02624
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for February 12, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties' joint report is due February 5, 2019. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/8/2019. (lcrmc1)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019 (Thuell, Mary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Thuell, Mary) Modified to add docket text on 1/8/2019 (znmw).
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER BY DEFENDANT FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC. f/k/a NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES INC. by FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC., NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC..(Scully, Patrick)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Summons Returned Executed; emailed to mthuell@mooneygreen.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint is undated as to the date of service upon Defendant FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC. Please refile document as to named defendant only. (ztth, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Thuell, Mary); Modified text on 1/3/2019 (tth).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Scully is admitted to represent Defendant North American Property Services,Inc. d/b/a Property Services International. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/26/2018. (lcrmc1)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Wright is admitted to represent Defendant North American Property Services,Inc. d/b/a Property Services International. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/26/2018. (lcrmc1)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick Richard Scully, :Firm- Sherman & Howard L.L.C., :Address- 633 Seventeenth Street, Suite 3000, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 297-2900. Fax No. - (303) 298-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5854018 Fee Status: Fee Paid . by NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick Richard Scully, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Baldwin, Raymond) Modified on 12/26/2018 to add receipt number (zrdj).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William A. Wright, :Firm- Sherman & Howard LLP, :Address- 633 17th Street Suite 3000 Denver CO 90202. Phone No. - 303.297.2900. Fax No. - 303.298.0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5854177. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Raymond)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zef, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary W. Thuell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thuell, Mary)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC., NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC., TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5790672) filed by CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER, FRANK A. MAXSON, RODERICK S. BASHIR, DAVID HUERTA, EDWARD J. MANKO, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, THOMAS LAMARTINA, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, EMANUEL PASTREICH, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, LAPHONZA BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(McDermott, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAN FACILITY MAINTENANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Raymond C. Baldwin
Represented By: William A. Wright
Represented By: Patrick R. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACILITY CLEANING INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Patrick R. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ALBRECHT
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BOUVIER
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAPHONZA BUTLER
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Lauren Powell McDermott
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?