BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC, ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, DECATUR, OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INCORPORATED, IJKG OPCO LLC, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH CORPORATION, ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, ST. VINCENT HEALTHCARE, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO NEW YORK, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BUTLER HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS, ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., NATHAN LITTAUER HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, CHAMPLAIN VALLEY PHYSICIANS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ELLIS HOSPITAL, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., THE CITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 1 OF TERREBONNE PARISH, STATE OF LOUISIANA, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BOARD OF HOSPITAL MANAGERS FOR THE CITY OF FLINT, HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION OF WILSON, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. and KALEIDA HEALTH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02705
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 11/30/2018 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/3/2018. (Webster, Stephanie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/27/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/26/2019. (Webster, Stephanie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Orloff, Serena)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It appears to the Court that the Supreme Court's decision in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484) will affect the disposition of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the Supreme Court's decision in Allina Health Services; it is further ORDERED that the deadline for defendant to file an answer is VACATED pending the lift of this stay; and it is further ORDERED that parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen days of the Supreme Court's opinion in Allina Health Services on the effect of the decision on further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/21/18. (lcjdb1)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BOARD OF HOSPITAL MANAGERS FOR THE CITY OF FLINT, BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BUTLER HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS, CHAMPLAIN VALLEY PHYSICIANS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ELLIS HOSPITAL, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION OF WILSON, HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 1 OF TERREBONNE PARISH, STATE OF LOUISIANA, HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC, IJKG OPCO LLC, KALEIDA HEALTH, KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INCORPORATED, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, NATHAN LITTAUER HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH CORPORATION, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO NEW YORK, ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION, ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, DECATUR, OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, ST. VINCENT HEALTHCARE, ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, THE CITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2668; 18-cv-00936. (Webster, Stephanie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, BOARD OF HOSPITAL MANAGERS FOR THE CITY OF FLINT, BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BUTLER HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS, CHAMPLAIN VALLEY PHYSICIANS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ELLIS HOSPITAL, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL, HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION OF WILSON, HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 1 OF TERREBONNE PARISH, STATE OF LOUISIANA, HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC, IJKG OPCO LLC, KALEIDA HEALTH, KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INCORPORATED, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, NATHAN LITTAUER HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH CORPORATION, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO NEW YORK, ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION, ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, DECATUR, OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, ST. VINCENT HEALTHCARE, ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, THE CITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Webster, Stephanie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5801623) filed by VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, IJKG OPCO LLC, ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, DECATUR, OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS, THE CITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION OF WILSON, WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. VINCENT HEALTHCARE, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC, CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION, HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 1 OF TERREBONNE PARISH, STATE OF LOUISIANA, NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH CORPORATION, VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., KALEIDA HEALTH, BUTLER HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS, NATHAN LITTAUER HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ELLIS HOSPITAL, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, CHAMPLAIN VALLEY PHYSICIANS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO NEW YORK, ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, BOARD OF HOSPITAL MANAGERS FOR THE CITY OF FLINT, LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INCORPORATED, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER, GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOOTENAI HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, DECATUR, OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENS FALLS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUGHLIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IJKG OPCO LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SISTERS OF CHARITY HOSPITAL OF BUFFALO NEW YORK
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUTLER HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL OF THE HOSPITAL SISTERS OF THE THIRD ORDER OF ST. FRANCIS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN LITTAUER HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAMPLAIN VALLEY PHYSICIANS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 1 OF TERREBONNE PARISH, STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER WYOMING VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF HOSPITAL MANAGERS FOR THE CITY OF FLINT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION OF WILSON
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEIDA HEALTH
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?