PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC., EAST COOPER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., 601 N STREET I, L.L.C., AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CGH HOSPITAL, LTD., TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., AMISUB, SLH VISTA, INC., TH HEALTHCARE, LTD., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C., TENET FRISCO, LTD., BBH BMC, LLC, NORTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD., WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC, VHS OF PHOENIX, INC., VHS WESTLAKE HOSPITAL, INC., VHS OF ILLINOIS, INC., VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., 601 N STREET I, L.L.C. formerly known as CREIGHTON SAINT JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, L.L.C. doing business as CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEMS HEALTHCORP doing business as ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET ST. MARY'S INC. doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, BBH BMC, LLC formerly known as BROOKWOOD HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as BROOKWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM BARTLETT, INC. doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SPALDING, INC. doing business as SPALDING REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SLH VISTA, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SL, INC. doing business as ST. LOUIS UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC. doing business as DESERT REGIONAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET GOOD SAMARITAN, INC. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC. formerly known as TENET HIALEAH HEALTHSYSTEM, INC. doing business as HIALEAH HOSPITAL, NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM NORTH SHORE, INC. doing business as NORTHSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SPALDING, INC., TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SL, INC., TENET FRISCO, LTD. doing business as CENTENNIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BROOKWOOD HEALTH SERVICES, INC., TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as SIERRA MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD. doing business as CYPRESS FAIRBANKS MEDICAL CENTER, COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as COASTAL CAROLINA HOSPITAL, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C. doing business as HAHNEMANN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC. doing business as DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, TENET HIALEAH HEALTHSYSTEM, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as PLACENTIA LINDA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC. doing business as METROWEST MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM BARTLETT, INC., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SINAI GRACE HOSPITAL, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF DALLAS, TENET GOOD SAMARITAN, INC., FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. doing business as PIEDMONT MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HEALTHSYSTEM NORTH SHORE, INC., TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC. doing business as SOUTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC. doing business as SAINT VINCENT HOSPITAL, TH HEALTHCARE, LTD. doing business as PARK PLAZA HOSPITAL, VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HARPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, TH HEALTHCARE, LTD. doing business as NACOGDOCHES MEDICAL CENTER, VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC doing business as BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as PALMETTO GENERAL HOSPITAL, HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC. doing business as WEST VALLEY HOSPITAL, LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as PROVIDENCE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., doing business as LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VHS OF PHOENIX, INC. doing business as ABRAZOS ARROWHEAD CAMPUS, TENET HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. doing business as LAKE POINTE MEDICAL CENTER, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC doing business as WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, VHS WESTLAKE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as WESTLAKE HOSPITAL, VHS OF ILLINOIS, INC. doing business as MACNEAL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TENET ST. MARY, CGH HOSPITAL, LTD. doing business as CORAL GABLES HOSPITAL, HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC. doing business as MARYVALE HOSPITAL, VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC. doing business as ABRAZOS ARROWHEAD CAMPUS, AMISUB doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SIERRA VISTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CREIGHTON SAINT JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, L.L.C., TENET HEALTHSYSTEMS HEALTHCORP, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC. doing business as LOUIS A. WEISS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. doing business as HOUSTON NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as SIERRA PROVIDENCE EAST MEDICAL CENTER and VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC. doing business as PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02736
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 motion to stay January 4, 2019 deadline. Defendant must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and, at that time, propose a revised schedule for the filing of the notice regarding consolidation of this case with Albert Einstein Healthcare Network v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/3/19. (DMK)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/18/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/26/2018 (Keough, Christopher)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay January 4, 2019 Deadline In Light of Lapse of Appropriations by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by January 4, 2019 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated. (tb)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by January 4, 2019 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/18. (DMK)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error because of incorrect judge being assigned. Judge from related case 17-cv-01134 added and updated summons reissued. (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/30/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/29/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/4/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/3/2018 (Keough, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 12/10/2018 (zef, ).
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zef, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by 601 N STREET I, L.L.C., AMISUB, AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BBH BMC, LLC, CGH HOSPITAL, LTD., COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., EAST COOPER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD., NORTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., SLH VISTA, INC., SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TENET FRISCO, LTD., TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C., TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC., TH HEALTHCARE, LTD., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1134. (Keough, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by 601 N STREET I, L.L.C., AMISUB, AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BBH BMC, LLC, CGH HOSPITAL, LTD., COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., EAST COOPER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD., NORTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., SLH VISTA, INC., SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TENET FRISCO, LTD., TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C., TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC., TH HEALTHCARE, LTD., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC. (Keough, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5807334) filed by EAST COOPER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC., SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CGH HOSPITAL, LTD., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TH HEALTHCARE, LTD., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., AMISUB, HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., SLH VISTA, INC., 601 N STREET I, L.L.C., TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C., TENET FRISCO, LTD., AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BBH BMC, LLC, LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Keough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALM BEACH GARDENS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST COOPER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 601 N STREET I, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGH HOSPITAL, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLH VISTA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TH HEALTHCARE, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET FRISCO, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH BMC, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF PHOENIX, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS WESTLAKE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF ILLINOIS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 601 N STREET I, L.L.C. formerly known as CREIGHTON SAINT JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, L.L.C. doing business as CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEMS HEALTHCORP doing business as ATLANTA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET ST. MARY'S INC. doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH BMC, LLC formerly known as BROOKWOOD HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as BROOKWOOD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM BARTLETT, INC. doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPALDING REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SPALDING, INC. doing business as SPALDING REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLH VISTA, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SL, INC. doing business as ST. LOUIS UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC. doing business as DESERT REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET GOOD SAMARITAN, INC. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC. formerly known as TENET HIALEAH HEALTHSYSTEM, INC. doing business as HIALEAH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly known as TENET HEALTHSYSTEM NORTH SHORE, INC. doing business as NORTHSHORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SPALDING, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM SL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET FRISCO, LTD. doing business as CENTENNIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKWOOD HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as SIERRA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA, INC. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF MANTECA
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW MEDICAL HORIZONS II, LTD. doing business as CYPRESS FAIRBANKS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COASTAL CAROLINA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as COASTAL CAROLINA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM HAHNEMANN, L.L.C. doing business as HAHNEMANN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC. doing business as DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HIALEAH HEALTHSYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as PLACENTIA LINDA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC. doing business as METROWEST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM BARTLETT, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SINAI GRACE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF DALLAS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET GOOD SAMARITAN, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. doing business as PIEDMONT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEM NORTH SHORE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET SOUTH FULTON, INC. doing business as SOUTH FULTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as DETROIT RECEIVING HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC. doing business as SAINT VINCENT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TH HEALTHCARE, LTD. doing business as PARK PLAZA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS HARPER-HUTZEL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HARPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TH HEALTHCARE, LTD. doing business as NACOGDOCHES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC doing business as BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFEMARK HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as PALMETTO GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC. doing business as WEST VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as PROVIDENCE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., doing business as LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF PHOENIX, INC. doing business as ABRAZOS ARROWHEAD CAMPUS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. doing business as LAKE POINTE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC doing business as WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS WESTLAKE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as WESTLAKE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF ILLINOIS, INC. doing business as MACNEAL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET ST. MARY
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGH HOSPITAL, LTD. doing business as CORAL GABLES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC. doing business as MARYVALE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC. doing business as ABRAZOS ARROWHEAD CAMPUS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SIERRA VISTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREIGHTON SAINT JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HEALTHSYSTEMS HEALTHCORP
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC. doing business as LOUIS A. WEISS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. doing business as HOUSTON NORTHWEST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED doing business as SIERRA PROVIDENCE EAST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 1, INC. doing business as PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?