UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $599,930.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH COOPERATING COMPANY 1 et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $845,130.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH APEX CHOICE LTD, $599,930.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH COOPERATING COMPANY 1, YUANYE WOOD LTD., NO 402 JIXINZUTUAN 10 XINQIAOTOU, WENZHOU, CHINA, APEX CHOICE LTD., 14/F, CHUN WO COMMERCIAL CENTRE, 25 WING WO STREET, CENTRAL, HONG KONG, $1,722,723.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH YUANYE WOOD CO LTD, APEX CHOICE LTD. and YUANYE WOOD LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02746
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by $845,130.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH APEX CHOICE LTD, APEX CHOICE LTD..(Cowden, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Cowden on behalf of $845,130.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH APEX CHOICE LTD, APEX CHOICE LTD. (Cowden, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Claim to Defendant Property by $845,130.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH APEX CHOICE LTD, APEX CHOICE LTD. (Cowden, William)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT (1) for Arrest In Rem Issued Electronically. (tth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Faruqui, Zia)
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1705. (Faruqui, Zia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faruqui, Zia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $599,930.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH COOPERATING COMPANY 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $845,130.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH APEX CHOICE LTD
Represented By: William R. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $599,930.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH COOPERATING COMPANY 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUANYE WOOD LTD., NO 402 JIXINZUTUAN 10 XINQIAOTOU, WENZHOU, CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CHOICE LTD., 14/F, CHUN WO COMMERCIAL CENTRE, 25 WING WO STREET, CENTRAL, HONG KONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,722,723.00 OF FUNDS ASSOCIATED WITH YUANYE WOOD CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CHOICE LTD.
Represented By: William R. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUANYE WOOD LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Zia Mustafa Faruqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?